Financial history ALBERBURY YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 1031865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £13.77k £16.28k £35.50k £6.91k £1.27k
Total expenditure £14.29k £14.79k £33.46k £10.95k £1.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A