Accounts and annual returns 1ST HORSLEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1031939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 February 2020 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required