INNER WHEEL CLUB OF TAVISTOCK BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1032079
Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018
Total gross income £1.47k £3.01k £3.15k £2.06k £3.73k
Total expenditure £1.46k £3.01k £3.20k £2.12k £3.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A