Accounts and annual returns BUDE SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB

Charity number: 1032099
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 December 2021 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window