Financial history BUDE SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB

Charity number: 1032099
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £56.48k £59.33k £77.61k £75.66k £48.74k
Total expenditure £61.57k £48.46k £57.82k £90.38k £37.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £400 N/A N/A N/A