Financial history FRIENDS OF ST BARNABAS C E PRIMARY SCHOOL (WARMLEY)

Charity number: 1032164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/09/2017 05/09/2018 05/09/2019 05/09/2020 05/09/2021
Total gross income £10.52k £11.28k £12.28k £5.28k £3.87k
Total expenditure £10.00k £18.00k £14.53k £6.50k £7.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A