Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF WIGTON TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1032233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 19 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 01 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required