Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF WIGTON TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1032233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £1.73k £1.43k £1.06k £560 £68
Total expenditure £1.10k £2.04k £1.08k £866 £400
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A