BUSY BEES PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1032318
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 11 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 11 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 27 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 27 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 06 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 06 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 05 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 02 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 02 February 2017 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)