BUSY BEES PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1032318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £87.13k £83.37k £81.41k £85.59k £76.05k
Total expenditure £75.63k £87.06k £80.62k £87.79k £71.02k
Income from government contracts £62.46k £62.50k £57.48k £53.46k £53.72k
Income from government grants £500 £0 N/A N/A N/A