BUSY BEES PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1032318
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lucy Swales Trustee 23 June 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, WOLLASTON Charity reporting is up to date
THE PAROCHIAL ROOM, WOLLASTON Charity reporting is up to date
KARINA KELLY-SMITH Trustee 23 June 2019 None on record
Suryia Sweet-Gallagher Trustee 23 September 2019 None on record
James MacKenzie Trustee 23 June 2016 None on record
Deborah Haw Trustee 23 June 2015 None on record
Ann Breen Chair 01 June 2020 None on record