ROTARY CLUB OF KIBWORTH AND FLECKNEY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1032400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 06 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 19 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 12 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required