ROTARY CLUB OF KIBWORTH AND FLECKNEY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1032400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £19.55k £22.32k £19.21k £20.26k £12.99k
Total expenditure £16.96k £23.58k £17.93k £19.72k £15.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A