INTERNATIONAL NETWORK FOR ENERGY HEALING (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education: Adult training courses and lectures on Energy Healing, certificated. Teacher training courses Conferences and Seminars with INEH Members and friends Production of INEH Journal twice per year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 February 1994: Standard registration
- INEH (Working name)
- INTERNATIONAL NETWORK OF ESOTERIC HEALING (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN VICTORIA FRANKLAND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susannah Lawson | Trustee | 04 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lesley Lock | Trustee | 27 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Ng | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN LEON YEARWOOD | Trustee | 17 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ANN BROOME | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.24k | £2.20k | £4.12k | £8.91k | £7.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.02k | £1.49k | £2.92k | £8.82k | £10.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 January 2022 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 November 2020 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/11/1993 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/1997 AS AMENDED ON 09/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/2013
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS BY ADVANCING THE KNOWLEDGE, PRACICE AND EXPERTISE OF ESOTERIC HEALING THROUGH EDUCATION, TEACHER TRAINING AND OTHER LAWFULLY CHARITABLE MEANS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nore House
The Street
Boxgrove
CHICHESTER
West Sussex
PO18 0DX
- Phone:
- 01243 412363
- Email:
- karenl.33@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window