YARM DISTRICT LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND
Charity number: 1032543
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The motto of Lions Clubs International is "We Serve". We do this by helping the needy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
Total income: £8,853
Total expenditure: £6,566
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
Registration history:
- 11 February 1994: Standard registration
- 20 August 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 20 August 2020: Funds transferred to 1181191 YARM DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.15k | £7.32k | £7.13k | £6.48k | £8.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.62k | £6.58k | £6.66k | £6.26k | £6.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 19 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 27 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 JANUARY 1994
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
TERRITORIAL AREA OF THE CLUB
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window