BASSINGHAM PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1032705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 December 2020 183 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 02 January 2020 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 02 January 2020 186 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 13 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 31 July 2017 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 July 2017 31 days late Download