PETPLAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1032907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £790.61k £895.14k £950.79k £1.56m £986.92k
Total expenditure £692.13k £1.16m £997.65k £1.17m £1.98m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £757.26k £858.41k £915.07k £1.52m £956.78k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £33.35k £36.73k £35.34k £42.15k £29.60k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £540
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £25.34k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £565.06k £1.16m £991.63k £1.16m £1.98m
Expenditure - Raising funds £127.07k £5.70k £6.02k £6.41k £6.40k
Expenditure - Governance £15.26k £15.33k £133.92k £116.25k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £549.81k £1.03m £857.71k £1.05m £1.98m
Expenditure - Investment management £5.10k £5.70k £6.02k £6.41k £6.40k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0