129 INNER WHEEL DISTRICT COMMITTEE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1033082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 June 2021 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 20 February 2021 296 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 23 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 12 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required