129 INNER WHEEL DISTRICT COMMITTEE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1033082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £2.66k £3.18k £931 £2.50k £1.42k
Total expenditure £2.66k £3.18k £931 £2.41k £1.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A