Financial history WEST DERBY WOMEN'S CLUB

Charity number: 1033092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/01/2018 28/01/2019 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.14k £1.40k £2.00k £489 £796
Total expenditure £1.88k £2.16k £2.31k £579 £1.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A