ASHURSTWOOD COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Charity run preschool with monies coming from West Sussex County Council funding, and fees as well as monies raised from fundraising. We operate Monday through to Friday with sessions available between 9am - 3pm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £107,687 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 24 February 1994: Standard registration
- ASHURSTWOOD COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Tester | Chair | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Flicker | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cressy Imber | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carlie Francois | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Buck | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Louise Bushell | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Agnes Katherine Rogers | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.69k | £97.56k | £71.75k | £118.67k | £143.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.53k | £96.70k | £78.83k | £111.75k | £153.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £60.69k | £87.43k | £107.69k | |
|
Income from government grants | £615 | £4.89k | £1.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashurst Wood Community Pre School
School Lane
Ashurst Wood
EAST GRINSTEAD
RH19 3QW
- Phone:
- 01342 825515
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window