BARTON ST DAVID PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1033698
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 July 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 July 2021 19 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 September 2020 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 September 2020 85 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 20 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 April 2017 On time Download