Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF THE NORTH COTSWOLDS TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1033739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 01 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 05 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 24 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 11 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 11 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window