Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF THE NORTH COTSWOLDS TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1033739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £26.07k £24.17k £25.34k £24.58k £17.50k
Total expenditure £26.81k £21.77k £25.74k £26.04k £14.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £750 N/A £750