BUSY BEES PRE-SCHOOL (DIBDEN PURLIEU)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to provide quality care and education to pre-school children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 28 February 1994: Standard registration
- BUSY BEES PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew James Gray | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Preeti Sunda | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Audoire | Trustee | 31 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.21k | £47.55k | £44.37k | £34.56k | £48.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.52k | £50.90k | £46.96k | £41.21k | £46.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £1.93k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 July 2020 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 July 2020 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 JANUARY 1994 AS AMENDED 25 SEPTEMBER 2008 AND 10 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUSY BEES PRE-SCHOOL
ST. ANNES NEIGHBOURHOOD CENTRE
WARRYS CLOSE
HYTHE
SOUTHAMPTON
SO45 3QR
- Phone:
- 02380842393
- Email:
- busybeeshythe@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window