LADY BOSWELL'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1034434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £13.77k £28.14k £21.39k £41.22k £13.64k
Total expenditure £9.60k £31.74k £18.40k £13.73k £20.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A