ST WINEFRIDES PLAYGROUP (HOLYWELL)

Charity Number: 1034654
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provider of childcare

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 28 August 2018

Total income: £61,922
Total expenditure: £61,830

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Flintshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 March 1994: Standard registration
  • 28 July 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 28 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1179493 ST WINEFRIDE'S PRESCHOOL (HOLYWELL)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 05/09/2015 05/09/2016 05/09/2017 28/08/2018
Total gross income £61.41k £74.91k £72.52k £63.30k £61.92k
Total expenditure £46.97k £74.91k £70.82k £66.06k £61.83k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £48.78k £44.80k £45.50k
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 August 2018 29 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 August 2018 29 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 05 September 2017 27 July 2018 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2017 27 July 2018 22 days late
Annual return 05 September 2016 22 August 2017 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2016 27 November 2017 145 days late
Annual return 05 September 2015 06 December 2016 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2015 06 December 2016 154 days late