Financial history READING AND DISTRICT GARDENERS MUTUAL IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1034695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £8.47k £9.09k £8.89k £2.98k £3.07k
Total expenditure £8.54k £8.48k £8.98k £3.10k £3.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A