READING AND DISTRICT GARDENERS MUTUAL IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1034695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Talks on topics relevant to gardening during winter months. Garden visits and plant sales during summer months

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,297
Total expenditure: £3,628

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Hampshire
  • Oxfordshire
  • Reading
  • West Berkshire
  • Windsor And Maidenhead
  • Wokingham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 March 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • READING GARDENERS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Valerie Ann Caesar Trustee 18 April 2022
None on record
Alexander Brian Siddall Trustee 08 May 2020
None on record
Jill Dodson Trustee 03 April 2019
None on record
Dr Stephen Leonard Jury Trustee 03 April 2019
BOTANICAL RESEARCH FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.89k £2.98k £3.07k £3.41k £3.30k
Total expenditure £8.98k £3.10k £3.44k £2.94k £3.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 Russet Glade
Emmer Green
READING
RG4 8UJ
Phone:
07818423789