FOXHOLE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1034708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 22 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 22 September 2019 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 18 June 2018 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 12 November 2017 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 29 December 2017 212 days late Download