Financial history ST JOHN HOUGHTON SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1034742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £11.32k £6.66k £4.92k £3.55k £2.48k
Total expenditure £5.56k £3.55k £283 £177 £21.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A