Financial history 1ST ORDSALL SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1034790
Charity reporting is overdue by 237 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.66k £3.63k £5.48k £9.82k £3.28k
Total expenditure £5.08k £5.08k £5.45k £6.16k £4.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A