Financial history NCFE

Charity number: 1034808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £20.26m £33.17m £35.45m £36.13m £38.79m
Total expenditure £19.82m £27.79m £29.03m £32.32m £37.78m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £696.73k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.17m £295.61k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £835.00k £1.11m £1.12m £1.19m £1.39m
Income - Charitable activities £19.02m £31.57m £33.80m £33.30m £36.81m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £401.00k £496.00k £527.00k £465.00k £303.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.17m £296.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £19.02m £26.91m £27.89m £30.56m £35.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £796.00k £881.00k £1.13m £1.75m £2.08m
Expenditure - Governance £99.00k £114.00k £836.00k £134.00k £165.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £39.00k £54.00k £54.00k £54.00k £54.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0