Trustees FRIENDS OF WESTWOOD SCHOOL
Charity number: 1034875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Jones | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Smith | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Castley-Adams | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Simpson-Morfey | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nia Solomon-Bennett | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Amanda Eades | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Eveleigh | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Michael James Green | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY DOWN | Trustee | 10 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.