KEECH HOSPICE CARE

Charity number: 1035089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 03 October 2016 On time Download