ST MARGARET'S PLAYGROUP (ORFORD)

Charity number: 1035109
Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £73.83k £78.76k £76.96k £142.56k £142.56k
Total expenditure £66.89k £76.16k £73.96k £124.67k £122.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A