Financial history ST MICHAEL'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1035144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £64.29k £60.12k £63.37k £59.48k £78.44k
Total expenditure £67.17k £61.51k £65.46k £62.51k £59.12k
Income from government contracts £49.10k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.83k N/A N/A £8.64k