Financial history THE CASTLE BROMWICH LADIES CLUB

Charity number: 1035351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £11.31k £10.05k £7.97k £1 £4.35k
Total expenditure £10.09k £9.95k £8.17k £627 £5.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A