Accounts and annual returns WORMLEIGHTON YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 1035390
Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 3 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 3 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 December 2021 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 December 2021 519 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 December 2021 885 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 31 March 2021 1005 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required