Financial history WORMLEIGHTON YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 1035390
Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.97k £2.89k £13.66k £3.29k £9.15k
Total expenditure £1.38k £3.37k £12.46k £838 £5.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A