FYLINGDALES PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre school setting for children aged birth-5 yr olds operating 8.30-5.30pm term time only.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 24 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dena Bagi | Chair | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joanne Parker | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Laura Hudson | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Hogarth | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leila Bagi | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan Louise Tindall | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Brennan | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.55k | £92.36k | £86.68k | £69.44k | £72.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.65k | £88.68k | £99.57k | £70.69k | £79.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £54.84k | £57.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 July 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 21 July 2021 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JULY 1992
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fylingdales Preschool Playgroup
St Stephens Church Rooms
Thorpe lane
Robin Hoods Bay
YO22 4RN
- Phone:
- 07964436779
- Email:
- 536649@NYEY.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window