Financial history CHALFONT ST PETER C OF E ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1035642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £39.01k £33.98k £32.87k £11.60k £2.78k
Total expenditure £40.15k £34.45k £39.54k £19.07k £111
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A