Trustees 25TH PETERBOROUGH (PASTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1035793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL ROBERTS Chair
None on record
Nina Lutterer Trustee 12 July 2018
None on record
Sarah Dunnell Trustee 12 June 2018
None on record
VANESSA CANN Trustee 12 June 2018
None on record
Rachel Phillips Trustee 12 June 2018
None on record
Nathan Setchfield Trustee 12 June 2018
None on record
Michelle Roberts Trustee 12 June 2018
None on record
James Blount Trustee 12 June 2018
None on record
Terence Griffiths Trustee 10 June 2017
None on record
Ian Webb Trustee 07 June 2016
None on record
Sandra Coupland Trustee 07 June 2016
None on record
Annette Donovan Trustee 07 June 2016
None on record
WENDY SAVIDGE Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
ELIZABETH GRIFFITHS Trustee
None on record
MADELEINE ROBERTS Trustee
None on record
DAVID MARRINGTON Trustee
None on record
CHRISTOPHER ROBERTS Trustee
None on record
TREVOR HOPKINS Trustee
None on record