Financial history ENDOMETRIOSIS UK

Charity number: 1035810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £266.09k £412.41k £504.30k £872.37k £868.87k
Total expenditure £200.23k £362.51k £358.67k £356.12k £580.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.00k £15.00k £25.00k £15.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £501.91k £484.82k £475.68k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £366.89k £383.37k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £143 £127
Income - Other N/A N/A £2.39k £20.51k £9.69k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £55.00k £28.96k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £292.69k £271.69k £454.73k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £65.98k £84.43k £125.71k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £7.94k £6.62k £11.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0