AFRICAN CARIBBEAN DAY NURSERY LIMITED

Charity number: 1035863
Charity reporting is overdue by 418 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 53 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 53 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 January 2020 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 January 2020 158 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 19 March 2019 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 19 March 2019 232 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 17 November 2017 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 10 April 2018 254 days late Download