AFRICAN CARIBBEAN DAY NURSERY LIMITED

Charity number: 1035863
Charity reporting is overdue by 448 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £108.71k £117.77k £100.06k £69.57k £134.61k
Total expenditure £130.27k £130.10k £109.50k £79.98k £126.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £34.09k £70.30k