ROBERTTOWN COMMUNITY CENTRE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1035965
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of pre-school facilities for children aged 2 to 5

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £131,577
Total expenditure: £185,362

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kirklees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 April 1994: Standard registration
  • 14 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ROBERTTOWN COMMUNITY CENTRE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £114.49k £96.98k £133.93k £165.14k £131.58k
Total expenditure £123.30k £107.76k £111.23k £150.02k £185.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £750 £8.23k £5.33k £1.80k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 08 June 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 09 June 2020 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window