THE TUDOR CAMPION FUND

Charity number: 1035990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.95k £9.88k £10.27k £10.60k £10.85k
Total expenditure £3.86k £5.11k £3.85k £5.97k £5.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A