THE TUDOR CAMPION FUND

Charity number: 1035990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marian Hawkes Trustee 01 May 2015
THE MILLAR CHARITY FUND Received: On time
HEREFORD MUNICIPAL CHARITIES Received: On time
David Fleet Trustee 01 May 2019
THE MILLAR CHARITY FUND Received: On time
HEREFORD MUNICIPAL CHARITIES Received: On time
Robert Stevens Chair 01 January 2017
THE MILLAR CHARITY FUND Received: On time
POLLY ANDREWS Trustee
THE MILLAR CHARITY FUND Received: On time
HEREFORD MUNICIPAL CHARITIES Received: On time
Paul Morris Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
SUSAN ANN BOULTER Trustee 01 September 2015
THE MILLAR CHARITY FUND Received: On time
HEREFORD MUNICIPAL CHARITIES Received: On time
THE ST. NICHOLAS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (HEREFORD) Received: On time
David Ludwig Howerski Trustee 01 January 2021
THE MILLAR CHARITY FUND Received: On time
HEREFORD MUNICIPAL CHARITIES Received: On time
Elizabeth Foxton Trustee 01 July 2020
THE MILLAR CHARITY FUND Received: On time
HEREFORD MUNICIPAL CHARITIES Received: On time