1ST INKPEN AND KINTBURY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1036011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required